IL SB0199 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that any person who knowingly possesses a controlled or counterfeit substance or controlled substance analog with respect to fentanyl is guilty of a Class 1 felony and shall, if sentenced to a term of imprisonment, be sentenced as follows: (1) not less than 4 years and not more than 15 years with respect to 15 grams or more but less than 100 grams of a substance containing fentanyl; (2) not less than 6 years and not more than 30 years with respect to 100 grams or more but less than 400 grams of a substance containing fentanyl; (3) not less than 8 years and not more than 40 years with respect to 400 grams or more but less than 900 grams of any substance containing fentanyl; and (4) not less than 10 years and not more than 50 years with respect to 900 grams or more of any substance containing fentanyl.
Title
CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES-FENTANYL
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |