IL SB0198 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Director of Labor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMPLOYMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-17SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201057Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback