IL SB0196 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that a public body may hold a closed meeting to consider the appointment, employment, compensation, discipline, performance, or dismissal of specific employees, specific independent contractors, or specific volunteers (currently, only specific employees) of the public body or legal counsel for the public body, including hearing testimony on a complaint lodged against an employee, independent contractor, or volunteer of the public body or against legal counsel for the public body to determine its validity. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OPEN MEETINGS ACT-EXCEPTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0005
2019-05-15SenateEffective Date May 15, 2019
2019-05-15SenateGovernor Approved
2019-04-11SenateSent to the Governor
2019-04-10SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-04-10SenateSenate Concurs
2019-04-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2019-04-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000
2019-04-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2019-04-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-04-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-04-02HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-04-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-03-29SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-03-28HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-20HouseArrived in House
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Local Government
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51202Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=196&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0196.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0196eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0196enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0005.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0196sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0196ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0196_03202019_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0196_04042019_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0196ham001_04102019_106000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback