IL SB0195 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision relating to employer contributions from special trust and federal funds, provides that, beginning July 1, 2017, the rate, expressed as a percentage of salary, shall be equal to the total employer's normal cost, expressed as a percentage of payroll. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TRS-TRUST FUND CONTRIBS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-001
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-01-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-01-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-01-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-01-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-01-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-01-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback