IL SB0190 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-3)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-3)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Adds the Illinois Community College Board as a governing body with responsibilities under the Act. Requires an institution to create a position to carry out the responsibilities of a liaison if the number of students experiencing homelessness or students in care exceeds 2% (rather than 1%) of the student body. Effective August 1, 2022.
Title
HIGHER ED-HOMELESS LIAISON
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0083 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 1, 2022 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |