IL SB0190 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alternate Fuels Act. Repeals a provision requiring the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to administer, subject to appropriation, the Clean Fuel Education Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-CLEAN FUEL ED PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017
2017-03-02SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41512032Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback