IL SB0182 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. Removes the limit on the total number of charter schools that may operate at any one time; makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-REMOVE CHARTR SCH LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | Held in Education; Subcommittee on Charter Schools | |
2009-02-25 | To Education Subcommittee on Charter Schools | |
2009-02-18 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-02-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=182&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0182.htm |