IL SB0175 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Cook County Water Infrastructure Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that, subject to appropriation, moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Environmental Protection Agency to make grants to municipalities to fund infrastructure improvements to facilitate water supplies from Lake Michigan for residents of Cook County. Provides that, in making grants from the Cook County Water Infrastructure Fund, the Agency must prioritize water infrastructure projects in non-supplying municipalities in Cook County over water infrastructure projects in supplying municipalities in Cook County. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
COOK CTY WATER INFRASTRUCTURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-01 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |