IL SB0171 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Provides that an active drycleaning facility that has previously received or is currently receiving reimbursement for the costs of a remedial action shall maintain continuous financial assurance for environmental liability coverage in the amount of at least $500,000 until the earlier of (i) January 1, 2030 (currently, January 1, 2020) or (ii) the date the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Council determines the drycleaning facility is an inactive drycleaning facility. Extends the repeal date for specified fee and tax provisions of the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act to January 1, 2030 (currently, January 1, 2020). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DRYCLEANER RESPONSE TRUST FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0400
2019-08-16SenateEffective Date July 1, 2020
2019-08-16SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-012-001
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 031-000-000
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Energy & Environment Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-05-08HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-05-07HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-05-01HouseArrived in House
2019-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-003-000
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
2019-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-001-001
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-05SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41513510Amended CodeCitation Text
41513540Amended CodeCitation Text
41513585Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback