IL SB0168 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a child care credit in an amount equal to 25% of the federal tax credit for each qualifying child. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CHILD CARE
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Sen. Win Stoller [R] | Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Erica Harriss [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=168&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0168.htm |