IL SB0157 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that notwithstanding whether the laws of the state or territory where the non-resident resides related to firearm ownership, possession, and carrying are substantially similar to the requirements to obtain a license under this Act, the Department of State Police shall allow for a non-resident license application if the applicant is employed by the United States Military permanently assigned in Illinois on Permanent Change of Station or Permanent Change of Assignment orders and who is not a resident of Illinois but maintains an address in Illinois. Provides that a non-resident applicant shall submit with his or her application a photocopy of Permanent Change of Station or Permanent Change of Assignment orders to an assignment in this State and an affirmation that the applicant possesses a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card with the Firearm Owner's Identification Card number or notice that the applicant is applying for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card in conjunction with the license application. Provides that a non-resident licensee a shall notify the Department of State Police within 30 days of moving to an address outside of this State, a Permanent Change of Station or Permanent Change of Assignment to a duty station outside this State, or a separation or retirement from the United States Military in addition to the notification requirements of the Act. Makes other changes.
Title
FIREARMS-NON-RESIDENT MILITARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=157&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0157.htm |