IL SB0150 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Community Health Center Construction Act. Provides that the Capital Development Board, in consultation with the Department of Public Health, shall establish the Community Health Center Construction Grant Program and may make grants to eligible community providers subject to appropriations. Provides that the grants shall be for the purpose of constructing or renovating new community health center sites, renovating existing community health center sites, and purchasing equipment to provide primary health care services to certain populations or areas. Contains provisions concerning grants, eligibility for grants, use of grant moneys, and reporting. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB HEALTH-COMM HEALTH CTR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-05 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-05 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-05 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-01-05 | Passed Both Houses | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 045-004-000 | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-004-000 | |
2011-01-05 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-003-000 | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-003-000 | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2011-01-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2011-01-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - January 5, 2011 | |
2011-01-05 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2011-01-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2011-01-04 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2011-01-02 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-12-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - December 2, 2010 | |
2010-12-01 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2010-12-01 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2010-12-01 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico | |
2010-12-01 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2010-12-01 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-12-01 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2010-12-01 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-12-01 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-12-01 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-12-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-027-000 | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-30 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-003-000 | |
2010-11-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-11-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-11-29 | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2010-11-29 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2010-11-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2010-11-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-11-17 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2010-11-17 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2010-11-17 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-11-17 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2010-11-16 | Remains in State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-11-16 | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost State Government Administration Committee; 008-007-000 | |
2010-11-16 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-11-16 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-11-16 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2010-11-10 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-11-10 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 1, 2011 | |
2010-10-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel | |
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-21 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-10-21 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009 | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-04-17 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2009-04-01 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-04-01 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-04-01 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-25 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-03-13 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2009 | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 | |
2009-02-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |