IL SB0140 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a person who has been granted a senior citizens homestead exemption need not reapply for the exemption. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TAX-SENIOR CITIZENS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-02-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-07SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-02-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-170Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback