IL SB0135 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services, in consultation with the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, shall develop a demonstration project within the Home Services Program under which a spouse may be reimbursed for providing care to his or her spouse, who is eligible for services through the Home Services Program and who meets the criteria for the demonstration project. Provides that the demonstration project shall operate in selected counties and be limited to serving no more than 100 unduplicated persons in a State Fiscal Year. Sets forth required components of the demonstration project. Requires that development of the demonstration project begin by July 1, 2009. Requires an interim report to the Governor and the General Assembly by March 1, 2010 and a report of findings and recommendations by March 1, 2011. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-HOME SERVCS-CAREGIVER
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Bomke [R] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Dale Risinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-05-01 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2009-04-21 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-04-21 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-04-21 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-04-21 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler | |
2009-04-02 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-03-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2009 | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass Human Services; 006-002-001 | |
2009-02-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Larry K. Bomke | |
2009-02-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2009-02-05 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |