IL SB0119 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that any person required to file a federal Form 1099-K with respect to a nonresident who performed services within the State during the taxable year shall file a copy of that form with the Department of Revenue. Provides that a third-party settlement organization that is required to file an information return under certain provisions of the Internal Revenue Code shall, within 30 days of the date the filing is due to the Internal Revenue Service, file a duplicate return with the Department of Revenue. Provides that third-party network transactions are subject to the $600 de minimis reporting requirements set forth in the Internal Revenue Code, rather than the de minimis reporting requirements otherwise applicable to third-party settlement organizations under the Internal Revenue Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-THIRD-PARTY REPORTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-10-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-006-000
2019-10-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-10-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019
2019-10-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Castro
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-04-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-21SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355502.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback