IL SB0100 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Records Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPLETE COUNT COMMISSION ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-16HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-12HouseArrived in House
2017-05-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Jones
2017-05-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51601Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback