IL SB0092 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the University of Illinois Act. Provides that a county is entitled to a scholarship in the University of Illinois for the benefit of the children of persons who served in the armed forces of the United States until any time on or after August 2, 1990 and until Congress or the President orders that persons in service are no longer eligible for the Kosovo Campaign Medal or the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNIV OF IL-VETERAN SCHOLARSHIP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-01-05SenateTo Appropriations- Higher Education
2022-01-05SenateRe-assigned to Appropriations
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-03-03SenateTo Appropriations- Higher Education
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Appropriations
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-03SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1103059Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback