IL SB0084 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of the Department of Natural Resources to deliver a quitclaim deed for a portion of real property in Peoria County to the Village of Dunlap for $1, subject to specified conditions. Amends Public Act 86-729. Provides that the property may also be used for a private drug addiction treatment center. Amends the Counties Code. Allows the operation of a private drug addiction treatment center on the property transferred to Kane County in Public Act 86-729. Provides that Kane County may lease portions of the property transferred to Kane County to a not-for-profit or for-profit company for a drug addiction treatment center and share in the drug addiction treatment center revenue. Provides that Kane County may authorize the expenditure of funds for a private drug addiction treatment center on the property transferred to the County. Amends Public Act 89-29 and Public Act 89-78, which included identical provisions authorizing the conveyance of certain property to Kreider Services, Inc., subject to certain conditions. Provides that Kreider Services, Inc. may convey the land by quitclaim deed to another party, subject to the condition that if the land is no longer used for the purpose of offering services to individuals with developmental disabilities or behavioral health needs, or both, the land shall revert to ownership by the State of Illinois. Makes corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
Title
DNR-LAND TRANSFER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0281 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2021-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-002 |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller |