IL SB0084 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-7)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0079
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-7)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0079
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to make application to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services by July 1, 2017 for a State plan amendment to implement the Community First Choice Option pursuant to the Social Security Act. Requires the Department, beginning on July 1, 2017, but no later than July 1, 2018, to submit applications to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for all Medicaid funding options available for people with intellectual and developmental disabilities, including a research and demonstration waiver application pursuant to the Social Security Act. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-TASK FORCE-SERVICE OPTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0079 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-04-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-04-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-04-06 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |