IL SB0079 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that if the Department of Human Services fails to notify a facility licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act or a supportive living facility authorized under the Code that a resident's application for medical assistance or long-term care benefits is rejected or denied, the Department shall reinstate the application effective the date of rejection or denial, the caseworker assigned to process the application shall identify and retrieve all missing information on behalf of the resident, and the facility and resident shall be notified of the reinstatement, any informational requests, and the outcome. Requires the Department to expedite the processing of all reinstated applications. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-REINSTATE APPLICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 11-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=79&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0079.htm |