IL SB0079 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that as a condition of initial eligibility for medical assistance benefits provided under the State's Medical Assistance program or, subject to federal approval, benefits provided under the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP), an applicant must pass a drug screening. Provides that as a condition of continued eligibility for such benefits, a recipient must pass random drug screenings as prescribed by the Department of Human Services. Requires the Department to (i) provide notice of drug testing to each applicant at the time of application; (ii) advise each applicant, before the test is conducted, that the applicant may, but shall not be required to, advise the agent administering the test of any prescription or over-the-counter medication the applicant is taking; (iii) ensure each applicant being tested a reasonable degree of dignity while producing and submitting a sample for drug testing, consistent with the need of the State to ensure the reliability of the sample; (iii) provide any applicant who tests positive with a list of licensed substance abuse treatment providers; and other matters. Provides that an applicant who tests positive and is denied medical assistance benefits or SNAP benefits as a result may reapply for those benefits after 6 months if the applicant verifies the successful completion of a substance abuse treatment program. Exempts persons with children in the assistance unit, persons with disabilities, persons who are 65 year of age or older, or persons who reside at a facility licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act or the ID/DD Community Care Act from the drug testing requirements.
Title
DHS-MEDICAID-SNAP-DRUG TESTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 1-10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.4b | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=79&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0079.htm |