IL SB0079 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that as a condition of initial eligibility for medical assistance benefits provided under the State's Medical Assistance program or, subject to federal approval, benefits provided under the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP), an applicant must pass a drug screening. Provides that as a condition of continued eligibility for such benefits, a recipient must pass random drug screenings as prescribed by the Department of Human Services. Requires the Department to (i) provide notice of drug testing to each applicant at the time of application; (ii) advise each applicant, before the test is conducted, that the applicant may, but shall not be required to, advise the agent administering the test of any prescription or over-the-counter medication the applicant is taking; (iii) ensure each applicant being tested a reasonable degree of dignity while producing and submitting a sample for drug testing, consistent with the need of the State to ensure the reliability of the sample; (iii) provide any applicant who tests positive with a list of licensed substance abuse treatment providers; and other matters. Provides that an applicant who tests positive and is denied medical assistance benefits or SNAP benefits as a result may reapply for those benefits after 6 months if the applicant verifies the successful completion of a substance abuse treatment program. Exempts persons with children in the assistance unit, persons with disabilities, persons who are 65 year of age or older, or persons who reside at a facility licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act or the ID/DD Community Care Act from the drug testing requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-MEDICAID-SNAP-DRUG TESTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-12SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-12SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30551-10.5New CodeSee Bill Text
305512-4.4bNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback