IL SB0076 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions of the Code of Civil Procedure pertaining to class actions. Adds further requirements concerning: prerequisites to the maintenance of a class action (including provisions that a class action may be certified only in the court where the defendant’s principal office is located, the plurality of the class members who are Illinois residents reside, or the cause of action arose for the plurality of class members, and a provision requiring that a class action be superior to other available methods for the fair and efficient adjudication of the controversy); preliminary determinations to be made by the court; notice to the class; coupon and other noncash settlements; loss by class members under a proposed settlement; and attorney's fees.
Title
CIV PRO-CLASS ACTIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-18 | Senate | To Judiciary- Torts |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary- Torts |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-808 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 2-809 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 2-810 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=76&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0076.htm |