IL SB0073 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Adds provision concerning prescription drug price increases. Requires manufacturers of prescription drugs to notify State purchasers, health insurers, health care service plan providers, and pharmacy benefit managers of specified increases in drug prices at least 30 days before such increase and the cost of specified new prescription drugs 3 days before the commercial availability of a new drug approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration or within 3 days after approval by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration if the new drug will be made commercially available within 3 days of such approval. Provides that within 30 days after such notifications, prescription drug manufacturers shall report specified information to the Department of Public Health and requires the Department to publish such information on its website. Provides that failure to report such information to specified entities shall result in a specified administrative penalty. Provides that the Department may adopt rules and issue guidance to implement these provisions and shall be responsible for enforcing these provisions. Contains provisions concerning the confidentiality of pricing information. Repeals provisions concerning prescription drug price increases on January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.
Title
DRUG MANUFACTURER-PRICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=73&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0073.htm |