IL SB0072 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that in all actions brought to recover damages for personal injury or wrongful death resulting from or occasioned by the conduct of any other person or entity, whether by negligence, willful and wanton misconduct, intentional conduct, or strict liability of the other person or entity, the plaintiff shall recover prejudgment interest on specified damages and costs set forth in the judgment. Provides that neither the State nor a local public entity shall be liable to pay prejudgment interest. Provides that for any personal injury or wrongful death occurring before the effective date of the amendatory Act, the prejudgment interest shall begin to accrue on the later of the effective date of the amendatory Act or the date the action is filed. Effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-PREJUDGMENT INTEREST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 40 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateSent to the Governor
2021-03-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-03-25SenateSenate Concurs
2021-03-25SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 037-017-003
2021-03-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 037-017-003
2021-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2021-03-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
2021-03-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-03-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2021-03-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-03-19SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-03-19SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2021-03-19SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-03-19SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2021-03-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - March 23, 2021
2021-03-19SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-040-000
2021-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-03-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2021-03-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-03-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-03-11HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-03-11HouseArrived in House
2021-03-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2021
2021-03-09SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2021
2021-03-03SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
2021-02-09SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2021-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
517510-130Amended CodeCitation Text
51755-115Amended CodeCitation Text
51755-120Amended CodeCitation Text
51755-125Amended CodeCitation Text
75551-2.18Amended CodeCitation Text
75551-2.25New CodeSee Bill Text
75551-2.26New CodeSee Bill Text
75556-5Amended CodeCitation Text
75556-6Amended CodeCitation Text
75558-1Amended CodeCitation Text
75558-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=72&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0072.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0072eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0072enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0072ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0072ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0072_03102021_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB0072_03182021_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0072ham002_03252021_004001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0072ham001_03252021_004000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback