IL SB0069 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Combines the changes made to the Section concerning child support by Public Act 99-90, Public Act 99-763, and Public Act 99-764. Adds provisions concerning the computation of the basic child support obligation. Makes changes concerning the child support guidelines, the duty of support, income calculation, presumptions in favor of the child support guidelines, minimum child support obligations, income greater than the support schedule, child care expenses, shared and split physical care, and health care. Replaces references to "supporting parent" and "payor" with references to "obligor". Makes other changes. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAMILY LAW-CHILD SUPPORT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-17HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-10HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-05HouseArrived in House
2017-04-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings
2017-03-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2017
2017-02-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505505Amended CodeCitation Text
7505510Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback