IL SB0067 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Newborn Metabolic Screening Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to provide all newborns with screening tests for the presence of metachromatic leukodystrophy. Requires the testing to begin within 6 months following the occurrence of specified milestones. Allows the Department to require payment of an additional fee for the provision of metachromatic leukodystrophy screening tests. Contains other provisions.
Title
NEWBORN METABOLIC SCREENING
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0368 |
2023-07-28 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-07-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-05-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-011-000 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 009-001-000 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Postponed - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |