IL SB0066 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Law Enforcement Gang Database Information Act. Provides that each law enforcement agency that maintains a gang database or has access to a shared gang database shall have a policy regarding those databases. Provides that the policy shall include, but not be limited to: (1) that personnel authorized to access a gang database or shared gang database are limited to sworn law enforcement personnel, non-sworn law enforcement support personnel, criminal justice entities, or non-criminal justice technical or maintenance personnel, including information technology and information security staff and contract employees, who have been subject to character or security clearance and who have received approved training; (2) any records contained in a gang database, shared gang database, gang-related information in a law enforcement agency case report, gang-related information in a law enforcement agency dispatch note, or gang-related information in a law enforcement agency dispatch system record shall not be disclosed for the following purposes: employment, education, licensing, or housing, except that law enforcement and criminal justice entities may use information contained in a gang database or shared gang database for employment purposes, and records contained in a gang database or shared gang database may be disclosed to comply with federal law, for national security or homeland security purposes, for military screening purposes, or for other appropriate law enforcement purpose; (3) security procedures; and (4) the review and purge process from gang databases and shared gang databases. Defines terms. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that in all criminal cases, evidence which indicates the mere presence that the person was or is on a gang database or a shared gang database is not admissible. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GANG DATABASE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255115-10.5aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback