IL SB0064 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that anything said or done during or in preparation for a restorative justice practice or as a follow-up to that practice, or the fact that the practice has been planned or convened, is privileged and cannot be referred to, used, or admitted in any civil, criminal, juvenile, or administrative proceeding unless the privilege is waived, during the proceeding or in writing, by the party or parties protected by the privilege. Provides that the legitimacy of a restorative justice practice, if challenged in any civil, juvenile, criminal, or administrative proceeding, shall be determined by a judge. Provides that the privilege does not apply when: (1) disclosure is necessary to prevent death, great bodily harm, or the commission of a crime; (2) necessary to comply with another law; or (3) a court, tribunal, or administrative body requires a report on a restorative justice practice, but such report shall be limited to the fact that a practice has taken place, an opinion regarding the success of the practice, and whether further restorative justice practices are expected. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-RESTORATIVE JUSTICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-15SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0100
2021-07-15SenateEffective Date July 15, 2021
2021-07-15SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-17SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-20SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-032-001
2021-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-05-18HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-18HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady
2021-05-14HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-06HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Restorative Justice Committee; 006-000-000
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-03HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-017-000
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 006-001-000
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2021-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7355804.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback