IL SB0062 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that for an amount held on a payroll card, an indication of owner interest includes wages from an employer under the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act in the form of a recurring Automated Clearing House credit previously authorized by the apparent owner. Provides that an Automated Clearing House credit is not an indication of owner interest if the holder assesses fees for account inactivity on the payroll card account.
Title
RUUPA-AUTOMATED CLEARING HOUSE
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0734 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 25, 2022 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 1026 | 15-210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |