IL SB0061 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0295
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that an animal shelter, animal control facility, or rescue group or transfer group shall not adopt out any dog or adopt out or return or release any cat unless it has been sterilized and microchipped. Increases administrative fines imposed by the Department of Agriculture for a violation of the Act. Increases fees for licenses issued under the Act. Provides that all fees, fines, and other money received by the Department under the Act shall be paid into the Department of Agriculture Animal Welfare Fund (rather than the General Revenue Fund) in the State Treasury for use in administering the Act. Amends the Animal Control Act. Provides that rabies impoundment, definitions, and the provisions of the Act are exclusive powers and functions of the State. Provides that the following administrative fines shall be imposed by the Department upon any entity that violates the Act or any rule adopted by the Department under this Act: (1) for the first violation, a fine of $3,000; (2) for a second violation that occurs within 2 years after the first violation, a fine of $5,000; and (3) for a third violation that occurs within 3 years of the first violation a fine of $10,000. Provides that all fees, fines, and other moneys received by the Department under the Act shall be paid into the Department of Agriculture Animal Welfare Fund in the State Treasury for use in administering the Act. Makes conforming changes to the State Finance Act. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMALS-ADMINISTRATIVE FINES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0295
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-004-000
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-09SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Holmes
2019-04-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 007-000-000
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
2019-03-21SenateDo Pass as Amended Agriculture; 011-000-000
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-14SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
2019-03-07SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-16SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256052Amended CodeCitation Text
22560520.5Amended CodeCitation Text
22560521Amended CodeCitation Text
22560522Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053.3Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text
510511Amended CodeCitation Text
51052.01Amended CodeCitation Text
51052.07Amended CodeCitation Text
51052.19-1New CodeSee Bill Text
51052.19-2New CodeSee Bill Text
51052.19-3New CodeSee Bill Text
510524Amended CodeCitation Text
510528New CodeSee Bill Text
510535Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=61&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0061.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0061eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0061enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0295.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0061sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0061sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0061sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0061sam004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0061_04112019_026000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0061_05242019_004000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback