IL SB0057 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Ski Slope Safety Act. Provides that every ski area operator shall ensure that skiers and snowboarders are not permitted to enter ski areas without protective helmets and requires all skiers and snowboarders to wear protective helmets while in a ski area. Sets forth penalties for violations of the Act. Provides that the Director of Public Health shall adopt reasonable rules to enforce compliance with the Act. Makes other changes.
Title
SKI SLOPE SAFETY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Held in Public Health |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=57&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB0057.htm |