IL SB0053 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Trustees of Schools Article of the School Code. Provides that the school boards of Glenbrook High School District 225, Northbrook Elementary School District 27, Northbrook School District 28, Sunset Ridge School District 29, Northbrook/Glenview School District 30, West Northfield School District 31, and Glenview Community Consolidated School District 34 may, by proper resolution, withdraw from the jurisdiction and authority of the trustees of schools of Northfield and Maine Townships and the township treasurer, provided that the school board shall, upon the adoption and passage of the resolution, elect or appoint its own school treasurer. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SCH TREASURER/TOWNSHIP
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=53&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0053.htm |