IL SB0047 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In regard to a claim, demand, or cause of action for injuries to an applicant for or recipient of certain financial aid and health care benefits programs, including the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance program and the Veterans' Health Insurance Program, provides that notice shall be served by certified mail or registered mail, or by facsimile or electronic messaging (rather than by certified mail or registered mail), upon the party or parties against whom the applicant or recipient has a claim, demand, or cause of action. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB AID-CAUSE OF ACTION-NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0073 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 15, 2013 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Frerichs |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 14, 2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 11-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |