IL SB0045 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
mends the Use Tax Act, Service Use Tax Act, Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the vendors discount under the Acts may no longer be claimed for returns filed on or after January 1, 2009. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall pay into the Truant Officers and Preschool Support Fund an amount equal to the amount that would have been retained by vendors as a result of the discount that was eliminated under the amendatory Act. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Truant Officers and Preschool Support Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC-VENDOR DISCOUNT
Sponsors
Sen. James Meeks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Postponed - Executive | |
2009-03-06 | Held in Executive | |
2009-02-27 | Postponed - Executive | |
2009-02-19 | Postponed - Executive | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=45&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0045.htm |