IL SB0032 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Provides that a person under 18 years of age shall not possess an alternative nicotine product. Establishes penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ALTERNATIVE NICOTINE PRODUCT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-11-10 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-29SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0496
2016-01-29SenateEffective Date June 1, 2016
2016-01-29SenateGovernor Approved
2015-12-03SenateSent to the Governor
2015-11-10SenatePassed Both Houses
2015-11-10SenateSenate Concurs
2015-11-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2015-11-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2015-11-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 10, 2015
2015-11-10SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-10-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2015-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2015-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 26, 2015
2015-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2015-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2015-05-22HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
2015-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-19HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-000-000
2015-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2015-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2015-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2015-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2015-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar
2015-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2015-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2015-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2015-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2015-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2015-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2015-05-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2015-05-13HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
2015-05-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-05-07HouseFirst Reading
2015-05-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2015-05-07HouseArrived in House
2015-05-07SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2015-05-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2015-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2015-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed
2015-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Amendment - Tabled Morrison
2015-05-07SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2015-04-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
2015-04-15SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-26SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2015-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2015
2015-03-25SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2015-03-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2015-03-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2015-03-18SenateReported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2015-03-04SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2015-02-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2015-01-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-15SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-15SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7206751.5Amended CodeCitation Text
7206752Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback