IL SB0032 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-12 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Duffy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Plumbing License Law. Provides that, if a unit of local government regulates reclaimed water systems, then those reclaimed water systems must meet specific requirements. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PLUMBING - RECLAIMED WATER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-12 Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Duffy
2010-01-11 Re-assigned to Rules Committee
2010-01-05 Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2009-05-31 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2009-05-30 Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley
2009-05-29 Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009
2009-05-22 Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009
2009-05-18 Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy
2009-05-18 Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2009-05-08 Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2009
2009-04-14 Assigned to Executive Committee
2009-04-02 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-04-02 First Reading
2009-04-02 Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
2009-04-02 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
2009-04-02 Arrived in House
2009-04-01 Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2009-04-01 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
2009-03-31 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009
2009-03-31 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Garrett
2009-03-31 Second Reading
2009-03-31 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
2009-03-30 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2009-03-24 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-24 Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
2009-03-17 Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy
2009-03-04 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2009-02-27 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2009
2009-02-27 Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
2009-02-26 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2009-02-25 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2009-02-20 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2009-02-20 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
2009-02-19 Postponed - Licensed Activities
2009-02-04 Assigned to Licensed Activities
2009-01-30 Referred to Assignments
2009-01-30 First Reading
2009-01-30 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback