IL SB0025 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that as soon as possible but not later than 24 hours, excluding Saturdays, Sundays and holidays, after emergency admission of a respondent to a mental health facility on an inpatient basis, the respondent shall be personally examined (rather than examined) by a psychiatrist. Provides that for the purpose of this provision, a personal examination includes an examination performed in real time (synchronous examination) via an Interactive Telecommunication System as defined in the Illinois Administrative Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDC-PSYCHIATRIC EXAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40553-610Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback