IL SB0013 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for the 2017 and 2018 levy years, the term "taxing district" means all taxing districts in the State, including home rule units. Provides that, for the 2017 and 2018 levy years, the extension limitation for those taxing districts is 0% or the rate of increase approved by the voters. Amends the School Code. Makes changes concerning contracts between a school board and a third party. Provides that local boards of education shall forward certain cost projections to the State Board of Education. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2022, the State Board shall review and analyze the cost projections and review for any cost savings and economic benefits. Requires the State Board to file a report by December 31, 2022. Imposes a moratorium on third-party contracts for non-instructional services while the State Board is preparing the report. Provides that a school district may offer a driver education course in a school by contracting with a commercial driver training school; sets forth requirements concerning the contract. Provides that school districts need not comply with and may discharge any mandate or requirement placed on school districts by the Code or by administrative rules adopted by the State Board of Education that is unfunded; with exceptions. Sets forth requirements concerning discharging mandates. Makes changes concerning physical education. Effective immediately, but this Act does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, and 12 of the 100th General Assembly become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-PTELL FREEZE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-01-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-01-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017
2017-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2017-01-24SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.34cAmended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text
105522-60Repealed CodeCitation Text
105522-62New CodeSee Bill Text
105527-24.2Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-6Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-7Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-185Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-205Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-213Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-214Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-242New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback