IL SB0009 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
Pending: Senate Environment and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Coal Ash Cleanup and Storage Act. Provides a short title only.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COAL ASH CLEANUP&STORAGE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-14SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback