IL SB0009 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Sugar-Sweetened Beverage Tax Act. Imposes a tax on distributors of bottled sugar-sweetened beverages, syrups, or powders at the rate of $0.01 per ounce of bottled sugar-sweetened beverages sold or offered for sale to a retailer for sale in the State to a consumer. Requires those distributors to obtain permits. Provides that 2% of the moneys shall be deposited into the Tax Compliance and Administration Fund for the administrative costs of the Department of Revenue, and 98% of the moneys shall be deposited into the General Revenue Fund. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes changes concerning the rate of tax. Extends the research and development credit for tax years ending prior to January 1, 2027. Creates an addition modification in an amount equal to the deduction for qualified domestic production activities allowed under Section 199 of the Internal Revenue Code. Makes changes concerning the definition of "unitary business group". Makes changes concerning estimated taxes. Amends the Film Production Services Tax Credit Act of 2008. Provides that no taxpayer may take a credit awarded under the Act for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2027. Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Makes changes concerning penalties and reports. Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Makes changes concerning the fee for filing articles of organization. Effective immediately, but this Act does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 10, 11, 12, and 13 of the 100th General Assembly become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BUDGET ECON STABILIZ/VIDEO TAX

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000
2017-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2017-05-28HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Approved Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2017-05-28HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Toi Hutchinson
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-05-24HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-24HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-24HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-05-24HouseArrived in House
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 032-026-000
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 8 Adopted; Hutchinson
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 7 Adopted; Hutchinson
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted; Hutchinson
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Withdrawn by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Withdrawn by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 8 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 7 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 8 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 8 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 7 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 7 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this Amendment will remain in the Committee of Assignments.
2017-03-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017
2017-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3510101-45Amended CodeCitation Text
351642Amended CodeCitation Text
3551501Amended CodeCitation Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text
355212Amended CodeCitation Text
355225New CodeSee Bill Text
355804Amended CodeCitation Text
355901Amended CodeCitation Text
80518050-10Amended CodeCitation Text
805513.70Amended CodeCitation Text
805514.30Amended CodeCitation Text
805515.35Amended CodeCitation Text
805515.65Amended CodeCitation Text
805515.97Amended CodeCitation Text
805516.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=9&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009eng.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009sam005.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009sam006.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009sam007.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009sam008.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0009ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0009_05232017_015000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback