IL SB0004 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Authorizes the issuance of an additional $7,000,000,000 in State General Obligation Restructuring Bonds. Provides that the proceeds from that bond sale shall be used for the purpose of paying vouchers incurred by the State prior to July 1, 2017. Effective immediately, but this Act does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 1, 2, 3, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13 of the 100th General Assembly become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GO RESTRUCTURING BONDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-18HouseArrived in House
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-015-006
2017-05-17Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Trotter
2017-05-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this Amendment will remain in the Committee of Assignments.
2017-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-02-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017
2017-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Appropriations I
2017-01-24SenatePostponed - Appropriations I
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3033011Amended CodeCitation Text
3033012Amended CodeCitation Text
3033013Amended CodeCitation Text
303302Amended CodeCitation Text
303302.5Amended CodeCitation Text
303307.6New CodeSee Bill Text
303309Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback