IL HR1374 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mourns the death of Lawrence "Larry" Matkaitis of Mt. Greenwood.
Title
MEMORIAL - LAWRENCE MATKAITIS
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. David Reis [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2016-08-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-08-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-08-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2016-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-08-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-08-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1374&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1374.htm |