IL HR1305 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Thanks House Majority Leader Barbara Flynn Currie for her 40 years of dedicated service to the people of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

THANKS-LEADER BARBARA CURRIE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29HouseResolution Adopted
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar Agreed Resolutions
2018-11-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-11-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback