IL HR1258 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes Tourette Syndrome Awareness Month, being held from May 15 through June 15, 2016 and declares May 31, 2016 as Tourette Syndrome Awareness Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
TOURETTE SYNDROME DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-05-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-05-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1258&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1258.htm |