IL HR1223 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May 29, 2016 as 529 College Savings Day in the State of Illinois to help raise awareness about the escalating costs of higher education and the importance of saving for college with the help of 529 college savings plans.
Title
529 COLLEGE SAVINGS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2016-05-23 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1223&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1223.htm |