IL HR1218 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares November 10, 2018 as "Ford Heights Community Service Organization Day".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FORD HEIGHTS COMMUNITY DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-09-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback