IL HR1210 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares September 9, 2018 as Fenwick High School Day and congratulates Fenwick High School, its administration, faculty, staff, students, and alumni, on 90 years of academic, athletic, and spiritual excellence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FENWICK HIGH SCHOOL DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-11-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-09-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback