IL HR1193 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages tolerance and the prevention of future violence by promoting education about diverse cultures and religions. Shows gratitude to the first responders, congregants, and the local community in Wisconsin who helped to save lives and prevent even greater losses after the devastating act of violence that occurred at the Sikh Temple of Wisconsin on August 5, 2012.
Title
ENCOURAGE RELIGIOUS TOLERANCE
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] |
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-27 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2012-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-08-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2012-08-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2012-08-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2012-08-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-08-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2012-08-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Biss |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1193&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR1193.htm |