IL HR1185 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to pass, without delay, the Remote Transactions Parity Act of 2015, which provides for the fair, uniform, simplified, and constitutional administration of and collection of state and local sales and use taxes.
Title
REMOTE TRANSACTIONS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-12 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1185&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1185.htm |